VT S0133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to juvenile jurisdiction
Title
An act relating to juvenile jurisdiction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 61, Nays = 81 (Y: 61 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-09 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-09 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-06 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read Third time |
2019-05-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-01 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2019-05-01 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-05-01 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 61, Nays = 81 |
2019-05-01 | House | Rep. McFaun of Barre Town moved to recommit the bill to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-05-01 | House | Rep. Rachelson of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-19 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Baruth |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Ingram |
2019-03-14 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |