VT S0102 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 20, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 20, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the regulation of agricultural inputs for farming
Title
An act relating to the regulation of agricultural inputs for farming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-06 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-06 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2021-05-06 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-05-04 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2021-04-30 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-04-30 | House | Rep. Partridge of Windham moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to |
2021-04-29 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-04-29 | House | Report of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry as amended agreed to |
2021-04-29 | House | Rep. O'Brien of Tunbridge moved to amend the report of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry, which was agreed to |
2021-04-29 | House | Report of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-04-29 | House | Rep. Toleno of Brattleboro recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-29 | House | Rep. Canfield of Fair Haven recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-04-29 | House | Rep. O'Brien of Tunbridge reported for the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2021-04-29 | House | Read Second time |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2021-03-30 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) MacDonald, Bray, Campion, McCormack, and Westman, text |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Finance |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Consideration postponed Wednesday, March 24, 2021 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Consideration postponed to Wednesday, March 24, 2021 on motion of Senator Starr |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2021-03-19 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | On motion of Senator Pearson, rules suspended bill was committed to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |