VT JRS039 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-04 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-04 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution providing for a Joint Assembly for the election of two legislative Trustees of the Vermont State Colleges Corporation
Title
Joint resolution providing for a Joint Assembly for the election of two legislative Trustees of the Vermont State Colleges Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2022-02-04 | Senate | House message: House adopted in concurrence |
2022-02-03 | House | Adopted in concurrence |
2022-02-03 | House | Action Calendar: On action calendar pursuant to Rule 52 |
2022-02-02 | House | Read First time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Adopted on the part of the Senate |
2022-02-02 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |