VT JRS010 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Motion agreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Motion agreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution expressing deep concern over growing wealth and income inequality and the decline of family income in Vermont
Title
Joint resolution expressing deep concern over growing wealth and income inequality and the decline of family income in Vermont
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Motion disagreed to |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senator Sirotkin motion to order bill to lie |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senator(s) Mullin motion to recommit bill to Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Nitka |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Pending question: Shall bill be read third time? |
2015-04-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Pending question: Shall bill be read third time? |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Pending question: Shall bill be read third time? |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Pending question: Shall bill be read third time? |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Consideration postponed to Thursday, April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Consideration postponed Thursday, April 16, 2015 on motion of Senator McAllister |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Motion disagreed to |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senator Snelling motion to order bill to lie |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs per Rule 51 |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2016/J.R.S.10 |
Text | http://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2016/Docs/RESOLUTN/JRS010/JRS010%20As%20Introduced.pdf |