VT JRS010 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Providing For A Joint Assembly For The Election Of A Sergeant At Arms, An Adjutant And Inspector General, And Three Trustees Of The University Of Vermont And State Agricultural College
Title
Joint Resolution Providing For A Joint Assembly For The Election Of A Sergeant At Arms, An Adjutant And Inspector General, And Three Trustees Of The University Of Vermont And State Agricultural College
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | House message House adopted in concurrence |
2013-02-05 | House | Adopted in Concurrence |
2013-02-01 | House | Read First Time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Adopted by Senate |
2013-01-31 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |