VT H0873 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-08 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-08 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to financing the testing for and remediation of the presence of polychlorinated biphenyls (PCBs) in schools
Title
An act relating to financing the testing for and remediation of the presence of polychlorinated biphenyls (PCBs) in schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |
2024-03-27 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-03-26 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-26 | House | Rep. Dolan of Waitsfield moved to amend the bill, which was agreed to |
2024-03-26 | House | Report of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to |
2024-03-26 | House | Rep. Mihaly of Calais recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | House | Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-26 | House | Rep. Conlon of Cornwall spoke for the Committee on Education |
2024-03-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-26 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-22 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-20 | House | Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee bill read first time |