VT H0854 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to promoting television and film production
Title
An act relating to promoting television and film production
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-14 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-03-13 | House | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to. |
2018-03-13 | House | Rep. Sullivan of Dorset reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-03-13 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-03-12 | House | Committee Relieved of further consideration on motion of Rep. Fagan of Rutland City and placed on the Calendar for Notice on Monday, March 12, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |