VT H0720 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor allowed to become law without signature on June 9, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor allowed to become law without signature on June 9, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the system of care for individuals with developmental disabilities
Title
An act relating to the system of care for individuals with developmental disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor allowed to become law without signature on June 9, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Allowed to become law without the signature of the Governor on June 9, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 3, 2022 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House message: House adopted Conference Committee report |
2022-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2022-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-11 | House | Notice Calendar: Report of Committee of Conference |
2022-05-10 | House | Senate Message, report of Committee of Conference adopted |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report; text |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Message, Committee of Conference members appointed |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Hooker, Hardy, and Terenzini |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House message: House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2022-05-03 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-03 | House | Speaker appointed Wood of Waterbury, McFaun of Barre Town and Noyes of Wolcott as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2022-05-03 | House | Which was agreed to |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Wood of Waterbury moved the House refuse to concur and asked for a Committee of Conference |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2022-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-02 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-02 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Hooker, Cummings, Hardy, Lyons, and Terenzini |
2022-04-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Hooker for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-25 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-22 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-22 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-18 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Wood of Waterbury, Brumsted of Shelburne, Garofano of Essex, Gregoire of Fairfield, McFaun of Barre Town, Noyes of Wolcott, Pajala of Londonderry, Pugh of South Burlington, Rosenquist of Georgia, Small of Winooski, and Whitman of Bennington agreed to |
2022-03-18 | House | Report of Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2022-03-18 | House | Rep. Yacovone of Morristown recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-18 | House | Rep. Wood of Waterbury spoke for the Committee on Human Services |
2022-03-18 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-18 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-17 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-08 | House | Committee bill read first time |