VT H0691 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to highway safety
Title
An act relating to highway safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-26 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 133, Nays = 7 (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | House | Passed |
2018-01-26 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 133, Nays = 7 |
2018-01-26 | House | Read Third time |
2018-01-26 | House | Rep. Gonzalez of Winooski asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2018-01-26 | House | Rep. Gonzalez of Winooski moved to amend the bill |
2018-01-25 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-01-25 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-01-25 | House | Rep. Van Wyck of Ferrisburgh moved to amend the bill |
2018-01-25 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-01-25 | House | Rep. Haas of Rochester moved to amend the bill |
2018-01-25 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester spoke for the committee on Transportation |
2018-01-25 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-24 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on January 24, 2018 |