VT H0600 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Mandatory Mediation In Foreclosure Proceedings
Title
An Act Relating To Mandatory Mediation In Foreclosure Proceedings
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Grad [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-01 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-01 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-03 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Campbell, Sears, and White | |
2012-05-03 | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sears | |
2012-05-03 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text | |
2012-05-03 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-04 | House message House appointed Conference Committee members | |
2012-05-01 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2012-05-01 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Campbell motion to amend proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-05-02 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-03 | Speaker appointed Grad of Moretown, Koch of Barre Town and Marek of Newfane as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed | |
2012-05-03 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-05-03 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Koch of Barre Town | |
2012-05-02 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-04-30 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-30 | Senator Campbell requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment | |
2012-04-30 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Campbell; text | |
2012-04-30 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2012-04-30 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-30 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-28 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-27 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-26 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-25 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Campbell | |
2012-04-25 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-24 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Campbell | |
2012-04-24 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-23 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-21 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-20 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-19 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-19 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-21 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-16 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-15 | Rep. Wizowaty of Burlington moved to amend the bill which was agreed to | |
2012-03-15 | Rep. Rep. Koch of Barre Town reported for the committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-15 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-14 | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-01-26 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |