VT H0556 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 20, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 20, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to exempting property owned by Vermont-recognized Native American tribes from property tax
Title
An act relating to exempting property owned by Vermont-recognized Native American tribes from property tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 20, 2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor on April 20, 2022 |
2022-04-14 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 14, 2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2022-04-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Hardy for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-31 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-02-17 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-02-17 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-02-16 | House | Report of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to |
2022-02-16 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-02-16 | House | Read Second time |
2022-02-16 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-02-15 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-01-11 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Ways and Means |