VT H0512 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous court and Judiciary related amendments
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous court and Judiciary related amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | House | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2019-05-17 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Sears |
2019-05-16 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears, Baruth, Benning, Nitka, and White; text |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-15 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Judiciary intact, on motion of Senator Sears |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sears |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-14 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-03-14 | House | Rep. Jessup of Middlesex moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-13 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-03-13 | House | Rep. Jessup of Middlesex moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-13 | House | Rep. Seymour of Sutton spoke for the committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 12, 2019 |