VT H0510 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2017 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Rep. Deen of Westminster moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Ways and Means which was agreed to.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2017 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Rep. Deen of Westminster moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Ways and Means which was agreed to.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the cost share for State agricultural water quality financial assistance grants
Title
An act relating to the cost share for State agricultural water quality financial assistance grants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Rep. Deen of Westminster moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Ways and Means which was agreed to. |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-05-03 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Pollina; text |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Branagan for Committee on Agriculture |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Agriculture |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Agriculture |
2017-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Agriculture |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee on Natural Resources and Energy relieved; bill committed to Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator Bray |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed |
2017-03-29 | House | Read Third time |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-28 | House | Rep. Helm of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | Rep. Ainsworth of Royalton spoke for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife |
2017-03-28 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee Bill read first time |