VT H0237 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to saliva testing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to saliva testing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-02HousePassed
2018-03-02HouseRead Third time
2018-03-02HouseWhich was disagreed to
2018-03-02HouseRep. Rachelson of Burlington moved to amend the bill
2018-03-02HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Rachelson of Burlington disagreed to
2018-03-02HouseWhich was disagreed to
2018-03-02HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Rachelson of Burlington
2018-03-02HouseRep. Rachelson of Burlington moved to amend the bill
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-03-01HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary as amended agreed to
2018-03-01HouseReport of the Committee on Judiciary amended as offered by Rep. Brennan of Colchester
2018-03-01HouseRep. Brennan of Colchester moved to amend the report of the committee on Judiciary
2018-03-01HouseRep. Willhoit of St. Johnsbury reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-03-01HouseReport of Committee on Transportation withdrawn
2018-03-01HouseRep. Brennan of Colchester reported for the committee on Transportation
2018-03-01HouseRead Second Time
2018-02-15HouseRep. Brennan of Colchester moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
2017-02-10HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Transportation

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback