VT H0204 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 6, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 6, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous provisions affecting navigators, Medicaid records, and the Department of Vermont Health Access
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous provisions affecting navigators, Medicaid records, and the Department of Vermont Health Access
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Signed by Governor on May 6, 2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 30, 2019 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 6, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2019-04-17 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Health and Welfare, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-04-16 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-20 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-19 | House | Rep. Houghton of Essex reported for the committee on Health Care |
2019-03-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |