VT H0158 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the beverage container redemption system
Title
An act relating to the beverage container redemption system
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Sheldon [D] | Rep. Seth Bongartz [D] | Rep. Kristi Morris [D] | Rep. Lawrence Satcowitz [D] |
Rep. Dara Torre [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2023-03-21 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2023-03-02 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2023-02-01 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Environment and Energy |