VT H0089 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 99-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 10, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to civil and criminal procedures concerning legally protected health care activity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to civil and criminal procedures concerning legally protected health care activity

Sponsors

Rep. Katherine Donnally [D]Rep. Martin LaLonde [D]Rep. Taylor Small [D]Rep. Julia Andrews [D]
Rep. Joseph Andriano [D]Rep. Peter Anthony [D]Rep. John Arrison [D]Rep. Angela Arsenault [D]
Rep. Sarita Austin [D]Rep. John Bartholomew [D]Rep. Daisy Berbeco [D]Rep. Matt Birong [D]
Rep. Alyssa Black [D]Rep. Tiffany Bluemle [D]Rep. Seth Bongartz [D]Rep. Michelle Bos-Lun [D]
Rep. Erin Brady [D]Rep. Jana Brown [D]Rep. Jessica Brumsted [D]Rep. Mollie Burke [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Burrows [D]Rep. Tesha Buss [D]Rep. Scott Campbell [D]Rep. Conor Casey [D]
Rep. Ela Chapin [D]Rep. Heather Chase [D]Rep. Seth Chase [D]Rep. Robin Chesnut-Tangerman [D]
Rep. Kevin Christie [D]Rep. Brian Cina [D]Rep. Sara Coffey [D]Rep. Esme Cole [D]
Rep. Peter Conlon [D]Rep. Timothy Corcoran [D]Rep. Mari Cordes [D]Rep. Carl Demrow [D]
Rep. Leonora Dodge [D]Rep. Karen Dolan [D]Rep. Kari Dolan [D]Rep. David Durfee [D]
Rep. Caleb Elder [D]Rep. Alice Emmons [D]Rep. Bobby Farlice-Rubio [D]Rep. Rey Garofano [D]
Rep. Leslie Goldman [D]Rep. Edye Graning [D]Rep. Troy Headrick [D]Rep. Rebecca Holcombe [D]
Rep. Robert Hooper [D]Rep. Lori Houghton [D]Rep. Mary Howard [D]Rep. Noah Hyman [D]
Rep. Kathleen James [D]Rep. Stephanie Jerome [D]Rep. Emilie Kornheiser [D]Rep. Emilie Krasnow [D]
Rep. Kate Lalley [D]Rep. Saudia Lamont [D]Rep. Diane Lanpher [D]Rep. Josie Leavitt [D]
Rep. Kate Logan [D]Rep. Emily Long [D]Rep. James Masland [D]Rep. Kate McCann [D]
Rep. Mike McCarthy [D]Rep. Jubilee McGill [D]Rep. Marc Mihaly [D]Rep. Brian Minier [D]
Rep. Michael Mrowicki [D]Rep. Emma Mulvaney-Stanak [D]Rep. Logan Nicoll [D]Rep. William Notte [D]
Rep. Daniel Noyes [D]Rep. Kate Nugent [D]Rep. Carol Ode [D]Rep. Kelly Pajala [I]
Rep. Avram Patt [D]Rep. Phil Pouech [D]Rep. Monique Priestley [D]Rep. Barbara Rachelson [D]
Rep. Mike Rice [D]Rep. Tristan Roberts [D]Rep. Lawrence Satcowitz [D]Rep. Robin Scheu [D]
Rep. Amy Sheldon [D]Rep. Laura Sibilia [I]Rep. Katherine Sims [D]Rep. Trevor Squirrell [D]
Rep. Gabrielle Stebbins [D]Rep. Thomas Stevens [D]Rep. Mary-Katherine Stone [D]Rep. Heather Surprenant [D]
Rep. Curt Taylor [D]Rep. David Templeman [D]Rep. Tristan Toleno [D]Rep. Dara Torre [D]
Rep. Joseph Troiano [D]Rep. Chea Evans [D]Rep. Kirk White [D]Rep. Jonathan Williams [D]
Rep. Theresa Wood [D]

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 10, 2023
2023-05-10HouseSigned by Governor on May 10, 2023
2023-05-04HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 4, 2023
2023-04-28SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2023-04-27HouseSenate proposal of amendment concurred in
2023-04-27HouseAction Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
2023-04-26HouseRep. LaLonde of South Burlington moved to postpone action until April 27, 2023, which was agreed to
2023-04-26HouseAction Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
2023-04-25HouseRep. LaLonde of South Burlington moved to postpone action until April 26, 2023, which was agreed to
2023-04-25HouseAction Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
2023-04-24HouseAction Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
2023-04-21HouseNotice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
2023-04-20HouseSenate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2023-04-19SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2023-04-19SenateMotion to amend Senate proposal of amendment agreed to
2023-04-19SenatePending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Lyons, Hashim, Baruth, Gulick, Hardy, Sears, Vyhovsky, and Weeks
2023-04-19SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-04-18Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 4
2023-04-18SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2023-04-18SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Hashim for Committee on Judiciary
2023-04-18SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2023-04-18SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2023-04-14SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2023-04-14SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-02-15SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-02-10HousePassed
2023-02-10HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 130, Nays = 13
2023-02-10HouseRep. Small of Winooski demanded yeas and nays
2023-02-10HouseRead third time
2023-02-10HouseAction Calendar: Third reading
2023-02-09HouseThird Reading ordered
2023-02-09HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2023-02-09HouseAmendment of Rep. Donahue of Northfield and Higley of Lowell ruled not germane
2023-02-09HousePoint of order ruled well taken
2023-02-09HouseRep. Bartholomew of Hartland raised a Point of Order
2023-02-09HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield and Higley of Lowell moved to amend the report of the Committee on Judiciary
2023-02-09HouseRep. LaLonde of South Burlington reported for the Committee on Judiciary
2023-02-09HouseRead second time
2023-02-09HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-02-08HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2023-01-24HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback