VT H0086 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Signed by Governor on 4/22/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Signed by Governor on 4/22/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Recognition Of The Elnu Abenaki Tribe As A Native American Indian Tribe
Title
An Act Relating To Recognition Of The Elnu Abenaki Tribe As A Native American Indian Tribe
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Bouchard [R] | Rep. Helen Head [D] | Rep. John Moran [D] | Sen. Kesha Ram Hinsdale [D] |
Rep. Brian Savage [R] | Rep. Thomas Stevens [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Signed by Governor on 4/22/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to the Governor on 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Passed the House and Senate on 4/7/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2011-04-06 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-05 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably by Senator Illuzzi for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-04-01 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-01 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-31 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-30 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2011-03-29 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2011-02-10 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-02-09 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-02-08 | Rep. Rep. Savage of Swanton reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Read Second Time | |
2011-01-21 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |