VT H0076 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Which was disagreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Which was disagreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the requirement of mandatory binding arbitration and to the elimination of strikes and imposed contracts in connection with collective bargaining for teachers’ and school administrators’ contracts
Title
An act relating to the requirement of mandatory binding arbitration and to the elimination of strikes and imposed contracts in connection with collective bargaining for teachers’ and school administrators’ contracts
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Wright [R] | Rep. Sarah Buxton [D] | Rep. Kevin Christie [D] | Rep. James Condon [D] |
Rep. Lawrence Cupoli [R] | Rep. Alyson Eastman [I] | Rep. Bernard Juskiewicz [R] | Rep. Patricia Komline [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 43, Nays = 104 (Y: 43 N: 104 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-08 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 75, Nays = 61 (Y: 75 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 79, Nays = 62 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 70, Nays = 73 (Y: 70 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-04-08 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 75, Nays = 61 (Y: 75 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 79, Nays = 62 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 70, Nays = 73 (Y: 70 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2015-04-09 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 43, Nays = 104 |
2015-04-09 | House | Read Third time |
2015-04-08 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 75, Nays = 61 |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2015-04-08 | House | Report of Committee on Education as amended agreed to |
2015-04-08 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 79, Nays = 62 |
2015-04-08 | House | Rep. Jewett of Ripton moved to amend the report of the committee on Education |
2015-04-08 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2015-04-08 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 70, Nays = 73 |
2015-04-08 | House | Rep. Lalonde of South Burlington, Wright of Burlington, and Christie of Hartford moved to amend the report of the committee on Education |
2015-04-08 | House | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the committee on General, Housing & Military Affairs |
2015-04-08 | House | Rep. Wright of Burlington reported for the committee on Education |
2015-04-08 | House | Read Second Time |
2015-03-19 | House | Rep. Head of South Burlington moved that the bill be committed to the committee on General, Housing & Military Affairs which was agreed to. |
2015-03-13 | House | Rep. Head of South Burlington moved that the committee on General, Housing & Military Affairs be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Education which was agreed to. |
2015-01-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing & Military Affairs |