VT H0065 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Delivered to the Governor on 2/16/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Delivered to the Governor on 2/16/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Fiscal Year 2011 Budget Adjustment
Title
An Act Relating To Fiscal Year 2011 Budget Adjustment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Delivered to the Governor on 2/16/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | Signed by Governor on 2/17/2011 | |
2011-02-11 | Passed the House and Senate on 2/11/2011 | |
2011-02-11 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-02-11 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2011-02-11 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-02-11 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-02-11 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Heath of Westford | |
2011-02-04 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-02-04 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2011-02-04 | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Kitchel , on behalf of the Committee on Appropriations agreed to | |
2011-02-04 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Kitchel | |
2011-02-04 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-02-02 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-02-02 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations, as amended, agreed to | |
2011-02-02 | Second and third proposals of amendment to the proposal of amendment offered by Senator Kitchel on behalf of the Committee on Appropriations agreed to | |
2011-02-02 | Motion by Senator(s) Kitchel to substitute the First of her proposals to amend the Proposal of Amendment of Appropriations agreed to | |
2011-02-02 | Senator Kitchel requested & granted leave to withdraw the First proposal of amendment | |
2011-02-02 | Senator(s) Kitchel motion to amend Committee on Appropriations proposal of amendment; text | |
2011-02-02 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-02 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Kitchel on behalf of Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-02 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-02-01 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-01 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-01-25 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-25 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-01-21 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-01-20 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-01-20 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 131 to Pass -- Yeas = 129, Nays = 2 | |
2011-01-20 | Rep. Haas of Rochester, Batchelor of Derby, Donaghy of Poultney, Donahue of Northfield, Frank of Underhill, French of Shrewsbury, French of Randolph, Grad of Moretown, Marek of Newfane, Martin of Springfield, McFaun of Barre Town, Mrowicki of Putney, Pugh of South Burlington, Reis of St. Johnsbury, Waite-Simpson of Essex, and Wizowaty of Burlington moved to amend the bill | |
2011-01-20 | Rep. Heath of Westford spoke for the committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-20 | Read Second Time | |
2011-01-20 | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration | |
2011-01-20 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 1/20/2011 |