VA SJR76 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (second resolution); real property tax; exemption for surviving spouse of a disabled veteran. Provides that the real property tax exemption for the principal residence of the surviving spouse of a disabled military veteran applies without any restriction on the surviving spouse's moving to a different principal place of residence.
Title
Constitutional amendment; real property tax exemption for spouse of disabled veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814) | |
2018-04-09 | House | Assigned Chapter 814 (effective 7/1/18) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ76ER) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Taken up |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104257D |