VA SJR63 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ63ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ63ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; expansion and funding of high-speed passenger rail service; report. Requests the Virginia Department of Rail and Public Transportation to study funding of high speed and intercity passenger rail operations in the Commonwealth.
Title
DRPT; study funding of high-speed and intercity passenger rail operations in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ63ER) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Title replaced 10105526D-H1 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Agreed to by House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SJ63H1 | |
2010-03-09 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105526D-H1 | |
2010-03-09 | House: Taken up | |
2010-03-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105526D-H1 | |
2010-03-04 | House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ63S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104526D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104526D-S1 | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: Studies | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102976D |