VA SJR358 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ358ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ358ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Amherst Fire Department.
Title
Commending Amherst Fire Department.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. Frank Wagner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ358ER) |
2017-02-17 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-03 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2017-02-03 | House | Received |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Presented 17105082D |