VA SJR272 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Constitutional amendment (first reference); qualifications of voters and the right to vote. Establishes that the sole qualifications to vote in the Commonwealth are being a United States citizen, at least 18 years of age, a resident of the Commonwealth, and registered to vote in accordance with the requirements set out in the Constitution of Virginia. The amendment further provides that any person who meets those qualifications has the right to vote and that such right cannot be abridged by law. The bill lifts restrictions on qualifications to vote for those who have been convicted of a felony or adjudicated to be mentally incompetent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; qualifications of voters and the right to vote (first reference).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (22-Y 15-N 1-A) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateAgreed to by Senate (22-Y 15-N 1-A)
2021-02-05SenateReading waived (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SJ272S1
2021-02-05SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 21104430D-S1
2021-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-05SenateRead second time
2021-02-05SenateFloor substitute printed 21104430D-S1 (Surovell)
2021-02-04SenateReading waived (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N)
2020-12-01SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100635D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback