VA SJR255 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first reference); fundamental right to reproductive freedom. Provides that every individual has the fundamental right to reproductive freedom and that the right to make and effectuate one's own decisions about all matters related to one's pregnancy cannot be denied, burdened, or otherwise infringed upon by the Commonwealth, unless justified by a compelling state interest and achieved by the least restrictive means. The amendment prohibits the Commonwealth from penalizing, prosecuting, or otherwise taking adverse action against an individual for exercising the individual's right to reproductive freedom or for aiding another individual in the exercise of such right, unless justified by a compelling state interest.
Title
Constitutional amendment; fundamental right to reproductive freedom (first reference).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2023-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to P&E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100026D |