VA SJR122 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ122ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ122ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia Chamber of Commerce.
Title
Commending the Virginia Chamber of Commerce.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Surovell [D] | Sen. Christie New Craig [R] | Sen. Travis Hackworth [R] | Sen. Ryan McDougle [R] |
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ122ER) |
2024-02-26 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-02-23 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2024-02-23 | House | Received |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Presented 24106107D |
Same As/Similar To
HR153 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill text as passed House (HR153ER)