VA SB998 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax; lower rate for certain businesses. Reduces the corporate income tax rate from six percent to three percent for the first three years after a business located (i) outside Virginia opens an office in a Virginia locality with population of 200,000 or fewer individuals and (ii) in a Virginia locality with a population exceeding 200,000 people opens a satellite office or operation in a Virginia locality with a population of 200,000 or fewer, for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2011. The capital investment made by the corporation must be $250,000 or more and the tax reduction may not exceed the amount of that capital investment.
Title
Income tax, corporate; lower rate for certain businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 9-N) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 9-N) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in Finance | |
2011-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 9-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Finance (8-Y 6-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103400D |