VA SB969 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
High school graduation requirements; verified credits. Requires the Board of Education, in establishing high school graduation requirements, to require students to earn one verified credit in history and social science by (i) the successful completion of a Board-developed end-of-course Standards of Learning assessment; (ii) achievement of a passing score on a Board-approved standardized test administered on a statewide, multistate, or international basis that measures content that incorporates or exceeds the Standards of Learning content in the course for which the verified credit is given; or (iii) achievement of criteria for the receipt of a locally awarded verified credit from the local school board in accordance with criteria established in Board guidelines when the student has not passed a corresponding Standards of Learning assessment. The bill prohibits such end-of-course Standards of Learning assessment from being a performance-based assessment.
Title
SOL; verified credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-03-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107667D-H1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB969S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106049D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106049D-S1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105709D |