VA SB965 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; prohibited contracts; exceptions for certain contracts entered into by an officer or employee of a soil and water conservation district. Provides an exception to the prohibition against contracts between employing agencies and their officers or employees for contracts by an officer or employee of a soil and water conservation district or an immediate family member of such officer or employee to participate in a cost-share program for the installation of best management practices to improve water quality. The exception does not apply to subcontracts or other agreements entered into to provide services for implementation of a cost-share contract established under such program. This bill is identical to HB 1472.
Title
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; prohibited contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 546 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB965ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100969D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Conflict of Interests
Contracts
Counties Cities and Towns
Drainage Soil Conservation Sanitation and Public Facilities Districts
Local Government and Officials
Conflict of Interests
Contracts
Counties Cities and Towns
Drainage Soil Conservation Sanitation and Public Facilities Districts
Local Government and Officials