VA SB96 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Norfolk; employees of officers; vagrants. Amends the charter for the City of Norfolk by changing from "election" to "appointment" the term used to describe the selection of certain officers by the city council and clarifying that employees of such officers serve at will. The bill also removes a provision authorizing the City to prevent persons having no visible means of support, paupers, and persons who may be dangerous to the peace or safety of the City from coming to the City and authorizing the City to expel such persons who have been in the City less than 90 days.
Title
Norfolk, City of; amending charter, employees of officers, vagrants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 528 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB96ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100674D |
Same As/Similar To
HB749 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0134)