VA SB956 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0181)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0181)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Overheight vehicles on the Hampton Roads Bridge Tunnel. Exempts from penalties applicable to overheight vehicles the driver of any vehicle exceeding the prescribed maximum height who is attempting to drive through the westbound tunnel of the Hampton Roads Bridge Tunnel and who elects to wait until the end of peak traffic periods so that the Department of Transportation or State Police may safely stop traffic and allow the vehicle to proceed in the opposite direction.
Title
Overheight vehicles; owner of vehicle to be fined for any damage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0181) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 181 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB956ER) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 21-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Passed House (77-Y 21-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB956S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104503D-S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104503D-S1 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102317D |