VA SB951 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uninsured motorist fee; repeal. Repeals the option to register an uninsured motor vehicle upon payment of the uninsured motor vehicle fee of $500. The repeal has an effective date of July 1, 2024. The bill authorizes the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to continue registering uninsured vehicles from July 1, 2023, to July 1, 2024, but provides that all such registrations shall expire prior to July 1, 2024.
Title
Uninsured motorist fee; removes option to register an uninsured motor vehicle upon payment of fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 538 (effective - see bill) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB951ER) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-14 | House | VOTE: Passage (82-Y 16-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed House (82-Y 16-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N 3-A) |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102400D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 214.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 646 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 646.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 707.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 902.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 66.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |