VA SB918 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; registration verification. Provides that the Department of Corrections or other supervisory personnel may cause to be physically verified by the Department of State Police the registration information on the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry that is required of registrants over whom the Department or the supervisory personnel exercise control. Under current law, physical verification must be carried out by the Department or the supervisory personnel.
Title
Sex offender registration; verification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 81 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB918ER) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-17 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15101264D-E |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB918E |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101264D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2228 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598)