VA HB2228 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; registration verification. Provides that the Department of Corrections (the Department) or other supervisory personnel may cause to be physically verified by the State Police the registration information on the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry that is required of registrants over whom the Department or the supervisory personnel exercise control. Under current law, physical verification must be carried out by the Department or the supervisory personnel.
Title
Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; registration verification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 598 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2228ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103056D-E |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2228E |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103056D |
Same As/Similar To
SB918 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)