VA SB911 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - House: Tabled in Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - House: Tabled in Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local grievance procedures. Allows the local government at its option to permit an observer for each party at the informal first step of the grievance process. The grievant and the local government at their option may also have an observer of their choice at each subsequent step of the process. These persons may observe only and may not participate, interrupt, or act as either party's representative until the final management step, unless otherwise permitted by the locality.
Title
Local grievance procedures; allows local government at its option to permit observer for each party.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - House - House: Tabled in Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | House: Tabled in Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 8-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-02-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 7-N) | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100519D |