VA SB882 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conformity of the Commonwealth's taxation system with the Internal Revenue Code; emergency. Advances Virginia's date of conformity with the Internal Revenue Code from December 31, 2021, to December 31, 2022. The bill enacts Chapters 6 and 18 of the Acts of Assembly of 2022, Special Session I. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Internal Revenue Code; conformity of the Commonwealth's taxation system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001) | |
2023-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1 (effective 2/27/23) | |
2023-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB882ER) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23101203D-E |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB882E |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/11/23 23101203D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1595 (Same As) 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0772)
HB1595 (Same As) 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0772)
HB1595 (Same As) 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0772)