VA SB852 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (38-Y 58-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (38-Y 58-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Lobbyists; annual statement of expenditures; penalty. Caps at $10,000 the civil penalty that may be assessed against a lobbyist and lobbyist principal for failing to file an annual statement of expenditures. Currently a $10-per-day penalty is assessed from the eleventh day after the deadline until the statement is filed, with no cap on the total amount of the penalty. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Lobbyists; annual statement of expenditures, penalty for failure to file.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (38-Y 58-N) (Y: 39 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (10-Y 7-N) (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (10-Y 7-N) (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: DEFEATED (38-Y 58-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Defeated by House (38-Y 58-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (10-Y 7-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102099D |