VA SB848 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; benefits for local law enforcement, correctional, and emergency response employees in certain localities. Permits any locality that is exempt from providing all of the special statutory retirement benefits to local law enforcement, correctional, and emergency response employees because the locality's annual retirement allowance for such employees exceeds the statutory amount, to provide all of the other statutory benefits except the statutory annual retirement allowance (i) to all employees eligible for such benefits or (ii) only to eligible employees hired on or after July 1, 2010. The additional costs of providing the benefits would be borne by the locality making the election.
Title
Retirement System; benefits for certain local employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2011-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 2-N) | |
2011-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101661D |
Subjects
Emergency Services and Vehicles
Pensions, Benefits, and Retirement
Police
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Pensions, Benefits, and Retirement
Police
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction