VA SB830 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory practice, affordable housing. Specifies that localities shall not discriminate by failing to grant an application for land use or the permitting of a development, which is to be used either wholly or in part as affordable housing, solely on that basis. This bill is recommended by the Virginia Housing Commission.
Title
Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory practice on applications that are for affordable housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-06 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-06 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103076D |