VA SB813 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sharing of forfeited assets; report. Provides that a state or local agency that receives a forfeited asset or an equitable share of the net proceeds of a forfeited asset from the Department of Criminal Justice Services (Department) or from a federal asset forfeiture proceeding shall inform the Department of (i) the offense on which the forfeiture is based, (ii) any criminal charge brought against the owner of the forfeited asset, and (iii) if a criminal charge was brought, the status of the criminal charge. The bill also provides that the Department shall include such information in the annual report that it provides to the Governor and the General Assembly concerning the sharing of forfeited assets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forfeited assets; state or local agency that receives net proceeds of asset from DCJS, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 666 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
2018-03-09SenateSigned by President
2018-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB813ER)
2018-03-06SenateEnrolled
2018-03-02SenateTitle replaced 18107549D-H1
2018-03-02SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB813H1
2018-02-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107549D-H1
2018-02-28HouseRead third time
2018-02-27HouseRead second time
2018-02-23HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107549D-H1
2018-02-23HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-14HouseRead first time
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-08SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-12SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104283D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192386.14(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB813
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB813+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB813H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB813ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0666+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0270+SB0813
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0329SB0813+SB0813
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0358SB0813+SB0813
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0185+SB0813
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0585+SB0813
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1165+SB0813
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0852SB0813+SB0813

Bill Comments

feedback