VA SB807 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; coal combustion residuals units; beneficial use projects. Directs the Director of the Department of Environmental Quality to suspend, delay, or defer the issuance of any permit to provide for the closure of any coal combustion residuals (CCRs) surface impoundment or other CCRs unit that no longer receives CCRs, located within the Chesapeake Bay watershed, until July 1, 2019. These limits do not apply to a permit required for an impoundment where CCRs have already been removed and placed in another impoundment on site, are being removed from an impoundment, or are being processed in connection with a recycling or beneficial use project. The measure also requires the owner or operator of such a CCRs surface impoundment or unit to issue a request for proposals (RFP) for entities to conduct recycling or beneficial use projects for the CCRs at such impoundment or unit. The RFP shall require responding entities to provide information from which the owner or operator is able to determine, among other things, the cost of the recycling or beneficial use of the CCRs. The owner or operator is required by November 15, 2018, to transmit to the Governor and certain committees and agencies a business plan that compiles the information collected through the RFP process.
Title
Coal combustion residuals and other units; permits, request for proposals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 632 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB807ER) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Title replaced 18107307D-H1 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB807H1 |
2018-03-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107307D-H1 |
2018-03-06 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107307D-H1 |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB807S1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106946D-S1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Incorporates SB708 (Chase) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106946D-S1 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18101730D |