VA SB8 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1243)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prevailing wage; public works contracts; penalty. Requires contractors and subcontractors under any public contract with a state agency, or with a locality that has adopted an ordinance requiring the payment of prevailing wages, for public works to pay wages, salaries, benefits, and other remuneration to any mechanic, laborer, or worker employed, retained, or otherwise hired to perform services in connection with the public contract for public works at the prevailing wage rate. The provisions of the bill would not apply to any contract for public works of $250,000 or less. The Commissioner of Labor and Industry is required to determine the prevailing wage rate for such public contracts on the basis of applicable prevailing wage rate determinations made by the U.S. Secretary of Labor under the provisions of the federal Davis-Bacon Act. A contractor or subcontractor who willfully employs any mechanic, laborer, or worker to perform work contracted to be done under the public contract at a rate that is less than the prevailing wage rate is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. In addition, such a contractor or subcontractor shall be liable to such individuals for the payment of all wages due plus interest and shall be disqualified from bidding on public contracts with any public body until full restitution has been paid to the individuals. The bill has a delayed effective date of May 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Public Procurement Act; public works contracts, prevailing wage rate, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 43-N) (Y: 48 N: 42 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 3-N) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1243)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1243 (effective 5/1/21)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB8ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (48-Y 43-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (48-Y 43-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB8ER)
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled
2020-03-05SenateTitle replaced 20109093D-H1
2020-03-05SenateChair votes Yes
2020-03-05SenateHouse substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
2020-03-05SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed House with substitute with amendment (54-Y 44-N)
2020-03-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB8H1
2020-03-04HouseCommittee on Appropriations amendment agreed to
2020-03-04HouseCommittee on Labor and Commerce substitute agreed to 20109093D-H1
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 20109093D-H1
2020-02-25HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20106725D-ES1
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB8ES1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106725D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (11-Y 5-N)
2020-02-03SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106725D-S1
2020-02-03SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 3-N)
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100503D

Same As/Similar To

HB833 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1216)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224321.3(n/a)See Bill Text
4016(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB8&201+sum+SB8
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB8+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB8S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB8ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB8H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB8ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB8ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1243+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0093+SB0008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0279+SB0008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0008+SB0008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0528SB0008+SB0008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0531SB0008+SB0008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0308+SB0008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0409+SB0008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0449+SB0008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0489+SB0008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1855+SB0008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1618SB0008+SB0008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1959SB0008+SB0008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2266+SB0008

Bill Comments

feedback