VA SB747 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Nondiscrimination in state employment. Prohibits discrimination in state employment based on race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, age, marital status, disability, sexual orientation, or status as a special disabled veteran or other veteran covered by the Vietnam Era Veterans Readjustment Assistance Act of 1974, as amended. The bill defines "sexual orientation" as a person's actual or perceived heterosexuality, bisexuality, homosexuality, or gender identity or expression. The bill expressly provides that "sexual orientation" shall not include any person's attraction toward persons with whom sexual conduct would be illegal due to the age of the parties. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Nondiscrimination in state employment; prohibited based on race, color, religion, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-02-14 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2011-02-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) | |
2010-10-29 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-10-29 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100229D |