VA SB741 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0576)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0576)
Summary
Department of Human Resource Management; staff augmentation services. Provides for the Department of Human Resource Management to work jointly with the Department of General Services and the Virginia Information Technologies Agency to develop expedited processes for the procurement of staff augmentation to supplement salaried and wage employees of state agencies. Under the bill, the Department of Human Resource Management may perform contract administration duties and responsibilities for any resulting statewide augmentation contracts.
Title
Human Resources Management; develop expedited processes for procurement of staff augmentation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0576) | |
2008-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 576 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB741ER) | |
2008-03-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-28 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: FOIA | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB741S1 | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 082407232-S1 | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 082407232-S1 | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 084809232 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB741 |