VA SB732 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0917)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Health Benefit Exchange. Creates the Virginia Health Benefit Exchange, which will be established and operated by a new division within the State Corporation Commission (SCC). The Exchange shall facilitate the purchase and sale of qualified health plans and qualified dental plans to qualified individuals and qualified employers. The Exchange shall make qualified plans available to qualified individuals and qualified employers by July 1, 2023, unless the SCC postpones this date. The measure authorizes the SCC to review and approve accident and sickness insurance premium rates applicable to health benefit plans in the individual and small group markets and health benefit plans providing health insurance coverage in the individual market through certain non-employer group plans. The Exchange will be funded by an assessment on health insurers, which is limited to three percent of total monthly premiums, except the SCC may, after a public hearing, adjust the rate as necessary to ensure the Exchange is fully funded. A health plan will not be required to cover any state-mandated health benefit if federal law does not require it to be covered as part of the essential benefits package. The essential health benefits are items and services included in the benchmark health insurance plan, which is the largest plan in the largest product in the Commonwealth's small group market as supplemented in order to provide coverage for the items and services within the statutory essential health benefits categories. The SCC may contract with other eligible entities and enter into memoranda of understanding with other agencies of the Commonwealth to carry out any of the functions of the Exchange, including agreements with other states or federal agencies to perform joint administrative functions. Such contracts are not subject to the Virginia Public Procurement Act (§ 2.2-4300 et seq.). The measure repeals a provision enacted in 2013 that prohibits an agent, employee, officer, or agency of the Commonwealth from taking any action to establish a health benefit exchange.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Health Benefit Exchange; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0917)
2020-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 917 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB732ER)
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled
2020-02-26SenateTitle replaced 20109134D-H3
2020-02-26SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (23-Y 17-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute (56-Y 44-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute SB732H3
2020-02-26HouseSubstitute by Delegate Sickles agreed to 20109134D-H3
2020-02-26HouseCommittee on Appropriations substitute rejected 20108786D-H2
2020-02-26HouseCommittee on Labor and Commerce substitute rejected 20108554D-H1
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-26HouseFloor substitute printed 20109134D-H3 (Sickles)
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108786D-H2
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108554D-H1
2020-02-18HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-07SenateRead third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
2020-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB732S2
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107470D-S2
2020-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20106587D-S1
2020-02-06SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-02-06SenateRead second time
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107470D-S2
2020-02-04SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-01-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106587D-S1
2020-01-27SenateIncorporates SB598 (Hanger)
2020-01-27SenateIncorporates SB226 (Edwards)
2020-01-27SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
2020-01-15SenateAssigned C&L sub: Health Insurance
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105262D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3824214(n/a)See Bill Text
3824319(n/a)See Bill Text
3824509(n/a)See Bill Text
3826500(n/a)See Bill Text
3826516(n/a)See Bill Text
5813(n/a)See Bill Text
581341.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB732&201+sum+SB732
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB732+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB732S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB732S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB732H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB732H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB732H3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB732ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0917+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0053+SB0732
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0122+SB0732
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0357SB0732+SB0732
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0395SB0732+SB0732
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0280+SB0732
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0386+SB0732
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1491+SB0732
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1105SB0732+SB0732

Bill Comments

feedback