VA SB715 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
TANF; feminine hygiene products. Requires the Board of Social Services to provide monthly payments for menstrual supplies in the amount of $10 to each female who is at least 10 years of age but not older than 55 years of age and is considered part of the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) public assistance unit. The bill also allows such payments to be made to females who are younger than 10 years of age or older than 55 years of age upon written certification by a licensed physician that the female has a need for menstrual supplies. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
TANF; menstrual supplies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (3-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20104304D-E |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB715E |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104304D |