VA SB704 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Chesapeake Bay Watershed Implementation Plan initiatives; nutrient management plans; stream exclusion. Sets December 31, 2025, as the target date to achieve the water quality goals contained in Virginia's final Chesapeake Bay Total Maximum Daily Load Phase III Watershed Implementation Plan (WIP). The bill provides that if the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry and the Secretary of Natural Resources (the Secretaries) jointly determine on or after July 1, 2026, that such goals have not been met by a combination of agricultural best management conservation practices, including the coverage of a sufficient portion of Chesapeake Bay cropland by nutrient management plans or the installation of a sufficient number of livestock stream exclusion practices, then certain provisions requiring the use of nutrient management plans and livestock stream exclusions shall become effective. The bill directs the Secretaries to convene a stakeholder advisory group to review annual progress toward the implementation of agricultural commitments in the WIP, develop a process to assist in creating nutrient management plans, and develop a plan for the stream exclusion program. The measure also directs the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board to establish by December 31, 2020, the official method for identifying perennial streams and directs the Department of Conservation and Recreation to establish by July 1, 2021, a portable stream fencing practice for inclusion in the Virginia Agricultural Best Management Practice Cost-Share Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chesapeake Bay watershed implementation plan initiatives; nutrient management plans for cropland.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB704ER)
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled
2020-02-26SenateTitle replaced 20108599D-H1
2020-02-26SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Passage (78-Y 21-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House with substitute (78-Y 21-N)
2020-02-24HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB704H1
2020-02-24HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108599D-H1
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108599D-H1
2020-02-19HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB704S2
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107786D-S2
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20107648D-S1
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107786D-S2
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-04SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107648D-S1
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105196D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32401(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.119(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.131(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB704&201+sum+SB704
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB704+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB704S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB704S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB704H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB704ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0058+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0256+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0704+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0704+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0704+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0704+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0704+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0229+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1265+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1011SB0704+SB0704

Bill Comments

feedback