VA SB665 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Learning; method of administration. Allows a local school division to administer any Standards of Learning assessment for elementary school students online or by paper.
Title
Standards of Learning; method of administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 12104303D |