VA SB66 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Failure to report missing child; penalty. Provides that any parent, guardian, or other person responsible for the care of a child under the age of 12 who, with intent to conceal the fact that the child is missing, fails to report to law enforcement that the child is missing within a reasonable period of time after discovery of the fact is guilty of a Class 6 felony.
Title
Abuse and neglect of a child; failure to report missing, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-27 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-02-15 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12100713D-E | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB66E | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-05 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100713D |