VA SB636 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Kinship Guardianship Assistance program. Creates the Kinship Guardianship Assistance program (the program) to facilitate child placements with relatives and ensure permanency for children for whom adoption or being returned home are not appropriate permanency options. The bill sets forth eligibility criteria for the program, payment allowances to kinship guardians, and requirements for kinship guardianship assistance agreements. The bill also requires the Board of Social Services to promulgate regulations for the program. This bill is identical to HB 1333.
Title
Kinship Guardianship Assistance program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770) | |
2018-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 770 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB636ER) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-02 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18103106D-E |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB636E |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103106D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |